Nicholas Mather
Fondateur chez SOLGOLD PLC
Fortune : 10 M $ au 30/06/2024
Profil
Nicholas Mather founded DGR Global Ltd.
in 1991, where he is working as Chief Executive Officer, MD & Director from 2012, Bow Energy Pty Ltd.
in 1996, where he worked as Non-Executive Director from 1996 to 2012, SolGold Plc in 2005, where he is working as Non-Executive Director from 2021, Arrow Energy Pty Ltd.
in 2000, where he worked as Executive Director from 2000 to 2004, Waratah Coal, Inc. in 2005, where he worked as Non-Executive Chairman in 2008, Orbis Gold Pty Ltd.
in 2006, where he worked as Non-Executive Director from 2006 to 2015, and Armour Energy Ltd.
in 2009, where he is working as Executive Chairman from 2009.
Mr. Mather also currently works at Tekton Minerals Pte Ltd., as Chairman, Lakes Blue Energy Nl, as Non-Executive Director from 2012, Samuel Capital Ltd., as Director, Samuel Holdings Pty Ltd., as Director from 1994, Clara Resources Australia Ltd., as Non-Executive Director from 2010, First Tin PLC, as Non-Executive Director from 2022, Conjugate Energy Ltd., as Director, and Australasian Institute of Mining & Metallurgy, as Member.
Mr. Mather also formerly worked at Tronox Mining Australia Ltd., as Chief Executive Officer & Managing Director from 1997 to 2000, NewPeak Metals Ltd., as Non-Executive Chairman, Ballarat Goldfields NL, as Non-Executive Director from 2002 to 2004, BNG Pty Ltd, as Director, Highlake Resources Pty Ltd., as Director, Auralia Resources NL, as Managing Director, Carbine Gold N.L., as Director, Diamond Resources NL, as Director, Magma Mines NL, as Director, Peregrine Gold Mining Pty Ltd., as Director, Peregrine Mineral Sands NL, as Director, Taronga Mines Pty Ltd., as Non-Executive Director, and Atlantic Lithium Ltd., as Non-Executive Director from 2018 to 2021.
Mr. Mather received his undergraduate degree in 1979 from The University of Queensland.
Détentions connues dans des sociétés publiques
Société | Date | Nombre d'actions | Valorisation | Date de valorisation |
---|---|---|---|---|
SOLGOLD PLC
2,99% | 17/11/2023 | 89 746 710 ( 2,99% ) | 10 M $ | 30/06/2024 |
Postes actifs de Nicholas Mather
Sociétés | Poste | Début |
---|---|---|
SOLGOLD PLC | Fondateur | 11/05/2005 |
DGR GLOBAL LIMITED | Fondateur | 01/07/1991 |
CLARA RESOURCES AUSTRALIA LTD | Directeur/Membre du Conseil | 21/10/2010 |
LAKES BLUE ENERGY NL | Directeur/Membre du Conseil | 07/02/2012 |
ARMOUR ENERGY LIMITED | Fondateur | - |
FIRST TIN PLC | Directeur/Membre du Conseil | 30/09/2022 |
Tekton Minerals Pte Ltd.
Tekton Minerals Pte Ltd. Precious MetalsNon-Energy Minerals Tekton Minerals Pte Ltd. owns and operates gold exploration projects. The firm specializes in mineral exploration, evaluation and project development. The company was founded in November 2011 and is headquartered in Singapore. | Président | - |
Samuel Capital Ltd.
Samuel Capital Ltd. Financial ConglomeratesFinance Samuel Capital Ltd. is a company based in Brisbane, Australia. | Directeur/Membre du Conseil | - |
Australasian Institute of Mining & Metallurgy
Australasian Institute of Mining & Metallurgy Miscellaneous Commercial ServicesCommercial Services Australasian Institute of Mining & Metallurgy, also known as AusIMM, is the leading organization for professionals working in the resources sector. AusIMM is based in Carlton, Australia, and has subsidiaries in Hong Kong. The Australian company's main focus is on shaping careers, showcasing leadership, creating communities, and upholding standards. | Corporate Officer/Principal | - |
░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░░ ░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░░░░░░░ ░░ ░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
Anciens postes connus de Nicholas Mather
Sociétés | Poste | Fin |
---|---|---|
░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | - |
░░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░ ░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
░░░░░ ░░░░ ░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
░░░ ░░░░░░ ░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
░░░░░░░ ░░░░░ ░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░ | ░░░░░░░░░░ |
Formation de Nicholas Mather
The University of Queensland | Undergraduate Degree |
Expériences
Fonctions occupées
Relations
Relations au 1er degré
Entreprises liées au 1er degré
Homme
Femme
Administrateurs
Exécutifs
Sociétés liées
Sociétés cotées | 8 |
---|---|
SOLGOLD PLC | Non-Energy Minerals |
DGR GLOBAL LIMITED | Non-Energy Minerals |
CLARA RESOURCES AUSTRALIA LTD | Non-Energy Minerals |
NEWPEAK METALS LIMITED | Non-Energy Minerals |
LAKES BLUE ENERGY NL | Energy Minerals |
ARMOUR ENERGY LIMITED | Energy Minerals |
ATLANTIC LITHIUM LIMITED | Non-Energy Minerals |
FIRST TIN PLC | Non-Energy Minerals |
Entreprise privées | 19 |
---|---|
Waratah Coal, Inc.
Waratah Coal, Inc. CoalEnergy Minerals Part of Mineralogy Pty Ltd., Waratah Coal, Inc. explores and develops coal deposits. The company is based in Brisbane, Australia. The Australian company was founded by Nicholas Mather. Waratah Coal was acquired by Mineralogy Pty Ltd. on January 05, 2009 for $65.65 million. | Energy Minerals |
Samuel Holdings Pty Ltd. | |
Australasian Institute of Mining & Metallurgy
Australasian Institute of Mining & Metallurgy Miscellaneous Commercial ServicesCommercial Services Australasian Institute of Mining & Metallurgy, also known as AusIMM, is the leading organization for professionals working in the resources sector. AusIMM is based in Carlton, Australia, and has subsidiaries in Hong Kong. The Australian company's main focus is on shaping careers, showcasing leadership, creating communities, and upholding standards. | Commercial Services |
Bow Energy Pty Ltd.
Bow Energy Pty Ltd. Oil & Gas ProductionEnergy Minerals Bow Energy Pty Ltd. operates as an exploration company that focuses on the discovery of commercial oil and gas fields with projects in several of Australia’s producing Basins. It also engages in the construction of the black water power station. The company was founded by Nicholas Mather on September 17, 2004 and is headquartered in Brisbane, Australia. | Energy Minerals |
Orbis Gold Pty Ltd.
Orbis Gold Pty Ltd. Precious MetalsNon-Energy Minerals Orbis Gold Ltd. engages in the exploration of gold and other minerals. The company was founded on June 15, 2006 and is headquartered in Brisbane, Australia. | Non-Energy Minerals |
Tronox Mining Australia Ltd.
Tronox Mining Australia Ltd. Other Metals/MineralsNon-Energy Minerals Tronox Mining Australia Ltd. engages in mining and processing mineral sands, as well as the sale of separated mineral sands products. Its mining and mineral separation operations located in two mineral sands provinces in Australia namely, the Murray Basin and southwest Western Australia. It operates through the following business segments: Eastern Australian Operations, Western Australian Operations and Other. The Other segments includes exploration, corporate, marketing, and financing. The company was founded by Julian Kinnear Ludowici in 1987 and is headquartered in Henderson, Australia. | Non-Energy Minerals |
Ballarat Goldfields NL
Ballarat Goldfields NL Precious MetalsNon-Energy Minerals Ballarat Goldfields NL explores and develops gold. The company focused on the Ballarat gold province in Victoria. The company is headquartered in Mount Clear, Australia. | Non-Energy Minerals |
Arrow Energy Pty Ltd.
Arrow Energy Pty Ltd. Contract DrillingIndustrial Services Arrow Energy Pty Ltd. explores, develops, and produces coal seam gas (CSG). The firm produces CSG from fields in the Surat Basin and Bowen Basin. It also supplies power stations such as the Townsville, Daandine, Braemar, Braemar 2, and Moranbah. The company was founded in 1997 and is headquartered in Brisbane, Australia. | Industrial Services |
Auralia Resources NL
Auralia Resources NL Precious MetalsNon-Energy Minerals Auralia Resources NL is an Australian company that explores gold mines. | Non-Energy Minerals |
BNG Pty Ltd
BNG Pty Ltd Gas DistributorsUtilities Part of CS CSG (Australia) Pty Ltd., BNG Pty Ltd operates a natural gas terminal. | Utilities |
Carbine Gold N.L. | |
Diamond Resources NL | |
Highlake Resources Pty Ltd.
Highlake Resources Pty Ltd. Precious MetalsNon-Energy Minerals Part of Octagonal Resources Ltd., Highlake Resources Pty Ltd. engages in the exploration and mining of gold. The company is based in Melbourne, Australia. The Australian company was founded by Stephen J. McPhail. Highlake Resources was acquired by Octagonal Resources Ltd. from Abbotsleigh Pty Ltd. on December 21, 2010. | Non-Energy Minerals |
Magma Mines NL | |
Peregrine Gold Mining Pty Ltd. | |
Peregrine Mineral Sands NL | |
Samuel Capital Ltd.
Samuel Capital Ltd. Financial ConglomeratesFinance Samuel Capital Ltd. is a company based in Brisbane, Australia. | Finance |
Taronga Mines Pty Ltd.
Taronga Mines Pty Ltd. Other Metals/MineralsNon-Energy Minerals Taronga Mines Pty Ltd. engages in the exploration of tin. The company was founded on August 3, 2007 is headquartered in St. Kilda, Australia. | Non-Energy Minerals |
Tekton Minerals Pte Ltd.
Tekton Minerals Pte Ltd. Precious MetalsNon-Energy Minerals Tekton Minerals Pte Ltd. owns and operates gold exploration projects. The firm specializes in mineral exploration, evaluation and project development. The company was founded in November 2011 and is headquartered in Singapore. | Non-Energy Minerals |