Historique de carrière de Tiina-Maija Johanna Mellas
Anciens postes connus de Tiina-Maija Johanna Mellas
Sociétés | Poste | Début | Fin |
---|---|---|---|
LEMMINKÄINEN | Directeur Technique/Scientifique/R&D | 26/08/2011 | 19/06/2014 |
Responsable des Ressources Humaines | 04/05/2010 | 19/06/2014 | |
Corporate Officer/Principal | 03/05/2010 | 04/05/2010 |
Statistiques
Internationale
Finlande | 2 |
Opérationnelle
Chief Tech/Sci/R&D Officer | 1 |
Human Resources Officer | 1 |
Corporate Officer/Principal | 1 |
Sectorielle
Industrial Services | 2 |
Fonctions occupées
Actives
Inactives
Sociétés cotées
Entreprise privées
Sociétés liées
Entreprise privées | 1 |
---|---|
Lemminkäinen Oyj
Lemminkäinen Oyj Engineering & ConstructionIndustrial Services Lemminkäinen Oyj engages in the provision of construction and engineering services. It operates through the following segments: Paving; Infra Projects; Building Construction, Finland; and Russian Operations. The Paving segment offers earthworks, civil, and rock engineering. The Infra Projects segment pertains to the firm's infrastructure and construction activities. The Building Construction, Finland segment develops and markets residential and commercial properties. The Russia Operations segment builds and sells housing projects. The company was founded in 1910 and is headquartered in Helsinki, Finland. | Industrial Services |
- Bourse
- Insiders
- Tiina-Maija Johanna Mellas
- Expérience